MD HB1061 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to require a certain property owner to register certain property with the county in order to offer the property for lease; authorizing the code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to charge a fee for registering certain property with the county and to impose a fine for a dwelling that is not registered with the county; and authorizing code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to conduct certain inspections and impose certain fines for certain violations.
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {688576/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-38) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690210/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB832 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Subjects
Apartments
Boundaries
Codes
Condominiums
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Places of Worship
Real Property
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Boundaries
Codes
Condominiums
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Places of Worship
Real Property
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |