MD HB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain entities that receive at least $2,000,000 of State capital funding in a prior fiscal year to submit, on or before October 1 each year, a report on deferred maintenance; requiring the report to include certain information and be submitted to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Appropriations Committee; etc.
Title
Capital Funding - Deferred Maintenance - Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Disclosure
Higher Education
Inspections
Operating Budget
Prices
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Capital Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Disclosure
Higher Education
Inspections
Operating Budget
Prices
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 8 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |