MD HB1061 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a cooperative housing corporation, a condominium, and a homeowners association to register annually with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; exempting specified common ownership communities from the applicability of the Act; establishing a Common Ownership Community Registry in the Department; providing for a $3 registration fee and specified contents of a registration form; making the failure to register a civil violation subject to a $50 fine; etc.
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-46) (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-46) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {970314/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Fees
Fines
Forms
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Job Training
Privacy
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Fees
Fines
Forms
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Job Training
Privacy
Real Property
Registration
Reports