MD HB1060 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Calvert County to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour on certain highways in the Solomons Island area without performing an engineering and traffic investigation, regardless of whether the highway is inside an urban district.
Title
Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Jerry Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Calvert County
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Calvert County
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |