MD HB106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to maintain a website where a consumer may report robocalls and other spam calls; requiring the Office to establish and promote an education campaign that informs consumers on how to identify robocalls and other spam calls and how to report them to the Office; requiring the Office to notify the Federal Trade Commission about certain reports it receives regarding robocalls and spam calls; and requiring the Office to make a certain annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1.
Title
Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-8) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273993/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-12-29 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Advertising
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Education
Federal Government
internet
Notices
Nuisances
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Education
Federal Government
internet
Notices
Nuisances
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 3203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |