MD HB1059 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the persons that the Department of Natural Resources is required to notify of applications for certain aquaculture leases to be issued in the Chesapeake Bay or the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to work with both a person that files a certain protest petition related to a proposed aquaculture lease and the applicant for the aquaculture lease to mitigate the concerns raised in the petition; and establishing conditions under which the Department is required to hold a certain public information meeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB950 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources411A-09(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback