MD HB1059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the persons that the Department of Natural Resources is required to notify of applications for certain aquaculture leases to be issued in the Chesapeake Bay or the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to work with both a person that files a certain protest petition related to a proposed aquaculture lease and the applicant for the aquaculture lease to mitigate the concerns raised in the petition; and establishing conditions under which the Department is required to hold a certain public information meeting.
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB950 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Petitions
Public Information
Real Property
Safety
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Petitions
Public Information
Real Property
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |