MD HB1058 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Ethics Commission to provide a certain training course to a certain State official on or after January 19, 2023; requiring a certain official to send a copy of a certain disclosure of a certain conflict of interest to the presiding officers of the General Assembly and the Ethics Commission; requiring a certain official who takes a certain executive action and has a certain interest to provide certain information to the Ethics Commission and the Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics; etc.
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {920418/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Disclosure
Ethics
Governor
internet
Job Training
Lieutenant Governor
Political Candidates
Privacy
Privatization
Public Information
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Disclosure
Ethics
Governor
internet
Job Training
Lieutenant Governor
Political Candidates
Privacy
Privatization
Public Information
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |