MD HB1057 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Prince George's County Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup to study and make recommendations to the Prince George's County Council on improving access to certain programming, facilities, and opportunities, the potential costs, benefits, and advantages of transferring the responsibility for certain operations from the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to another entity; and requiring the Workgroup to submit its recommendations to the Prince George's County Council by April 11, 2023.
Title
Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393326/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Emergency Bills
Forests and Parks
Laws and Ordinances
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Minorities
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sports and Recreation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Emergency Bills
Forests and Parks
Laws and Ordinances
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Minorities
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sports and Recreation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 31 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 31 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 31 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |