MD HB1057 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to work with the historically black colleges and universities (HBCUs) in the State to approve and prioritize certain academic programs and to promote the overall competitiveness of the HBCUs; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget certain funds for certain HBCUs to be used for a specific purpose; requiring that certain funds become part of the base funds for certain HBCUs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Comparability and Competitiveness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB856 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education11206(n/a)See Bill Text
Education11206.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education12119(n/a)See Bill Text
Education14111(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback