MD HB1056 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the expiration date for implied warranties for dwellings and establishing a procedure to allow a vendor to repair an alleged breach of an implied warranty prior to the owner commencing an action regarding the alleged breach.
Title
Real Property - Warranties - Duration of Warranties and Repair of Defects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Construction
Inspections
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Residential Property
Statutes of Limitation
Warranties
Inspections
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Residential Property
Statutes of Limitation
Warranties
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 10 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |