MD HB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Racing Commission to establish the Equine Health, Safety, and Welfare Advisory Committee; requiring the owner of the Bowie Race Course Training Center to convey the property to the City of Bowie in a certain manner; authorizing, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue up to $375,000,000 of bonds for the redevelopment of certain racing facilities, including Laurel Park and Pimlico; establishing certain funds for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racing and Community Development Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {839233/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (122-8)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {773921/1 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {155565/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation111203(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11209(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11213(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11511(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11519(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11520(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11521(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10601(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10620(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10628(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10646.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10657.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10657.3(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9120(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-09(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-27(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-28(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-29(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-31(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10207(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10307(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11236(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property12108(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13207(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13410(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property7246(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback