MD HB1056 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Queen Anne's County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Queen Anne's County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (41-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback