MD HB1055 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying an exception to the definition of the term "entity" to include a governmental unit that employs an individual regulated lobbyist for the purposes of allowing certain officials and employees to accept certain gifts under certain circumstances; repealing a provision of law that exempts from regulation of lobbying activities an appearance of a certain employee of an association engaged only in representing counties or municipal corporations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB974 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5505(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5702(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback