MD HB1053 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of a condominium to convene at least two meetings each year; requiring a developer of a condominium or a declarant of a homeowners association to convene a certain annual meeting under certain circumstances; requiring certain meetings to include an opportunity for certain unit owners or lot owners to provide comment; requiring the developer of a condominium to appoint a unit owner to the board of directors within 30 days after 25% of the currently subdivided units have been conveyed to the public; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {220116/2 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property11109(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11114.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11116(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11132(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B101(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B106.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B111(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B111.6(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B112(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback