MD HB1053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain requirements for a Class 7 micro-brewery license issued for the same premises as a certain restaurant; authorizing the holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license to hold a Class 8 farm brewery license; altering from two to five the number of Class B (on-sale) beer, wine, and liquor licenses the Board of License Commissioners for Howard County may issue for separate premises to an individual or for the use of a person under a certain multiple alcoholic beverages licensing plan; etc.
Title
Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813798/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Howard County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Howard County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants