MD HB1049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1422
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum number of years of eligibility service that certain members of the State Police Retirement System may have to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) to 30; increasing the number of years that certain members of the State Police Retirement System may participate in the DROP; authorizing certain individuals, subject to certain limitations and requirements, to elect to extend their participation in the DROP; etc.
Title
State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {344269/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Carry Over) 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725