MD HB1048 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a vendor of property on which a dwelling built before December 31, 1977, is located to deliver to specified purchasers the results of a specified lead-contaminated dust test at least 7 days before settlement of a contract for the sale of the property.
Title
Real Property - Sale of Property - Lead-Contaminated Dust Test Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |