MD HB1047 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Senate Refuses Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Elections to complete a comprehensive report analyzing the election after each statewide election; requiring the report to be posted on the State Board's website and submitted to the General Assembly; requiring that certain guidelines for absentee voting provide for the return of absentee ballots using ballot drop boxes and for voter access to information concerning the status of the voter's absentee ballot; requiring the State Board to ensure that ballot drop boxes are available during a certain period; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseSenate Refuses Recede
2021-04-10SenateSenate Refuses Recede
2021-04-10SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilkins, Washington and Feldmark)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Requests Senate Recede
2021-04-10SenateHouse Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
2021-04-09HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilkins, Washington and Feldmark)
2021-04-09HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2021-04-09HouseHouse Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (34-13)
2021-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {334233/1 Adopted
2021-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (95-38)
2021-03-20HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (94-40)
2021-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {885163/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-10HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law9310.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback