MD HB1047 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from 60 to 120 days the time period that an individual with a commercial driver's license may be out of compliance with the most recent order of the court in making child support payments before the Child Support Enforcement Administration may notify the Motor Vehicle Administration to suspend the individual's driver's license; altering the circumstances under which the Child Support Enforcement Administration may request that a specified licensing authority suspend or deny a specified license; etc.
Title
Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {812614/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment