MD HB1046 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified employees of the City of College Park who are employed by the City of College Park on the date the City of College Park joins the Employees' Pension System to participate in the Employees' Pension System as of that date; providing that membership in the Employees' Pension System is optional for specified employees of the City of College Park; providing for specified employees of the City of College Park to receive service credit equal to 60% of the employee's service with the City of College Park; etc.
Title
City of College Park Employees - Participation in the Employees' Pension System PG 404-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 9:00 a.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement