MD HB1046 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is a registered sex offender; providing that a judge may authorize the pretrial release of a registered sex offender on suitable bail or other conditions or both; adding the imposition of lifetime sexual offender supervision as a reportable event that must be reported to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Restrictions on Pretrial
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] |
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Norman Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Special Order 3/17 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Bail
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Ex-Offenders
Judges
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Bail
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Ex-Offenders
Judges
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses