MD HB1043 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to install, replace, or have installed or replaced, a specified on-site sewage disposal system that does not utilize specified nitrogen removal technology on specified property located outside the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area; etc.
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Construction
Environment
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Coastal Bays
Construction
Environment
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Sewage