MD HB1042 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on certain newly constructed or substantially rehabilitated dwellings; requiring that the property tax credit be equal to certain amounts in certain taxable years; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to provide for certain matters relating to the property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1042?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1042f.pdf |