MD HB1042 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum benefit from 60% to 65% that a member of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may receive for the normal service retirement allowance.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-14) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |