MD HB1041 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from 1 to 3, the maximum number of apprentice barbers per master barber that a barber shop may employ at the same time; and repealing a limit on the total number of apprentice barbers that a barbershop may employ at the same time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Occupations and Professions4507(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback