MD HB1040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license genetic counselors; providing that provisions of the Act do not limit the right of certain individuals to practice certain occupations; establishing the Genetic Counseling Advisory Committee within the Board; requiring individuals, on or after October 1, 2022, to be licensed by the Board as genetic counselors before practicing genetic counseling in the State except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB763 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations14-5G01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G10(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G12(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G14(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G15(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G16(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G17(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G18(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G19(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G20(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G21(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G22(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G23(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G24(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G25(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G26(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G27(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G28(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G5(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G6(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G7(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G8(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback