MD HB1040 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law relating to regulation of numismatic items; providing that specified provisions of law do not apply to retail jewelers who participate in a remount sale; requiring specified dealers and pawnbrokers to hold specified items for an additional number of days on request of a primary law enforcement unit under specified circumstances; defining "remount sale"; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203495/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |