MD HB1039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least a certain age, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoptions records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (131-7)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB743 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law5321(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5339(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5351(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5359(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-19(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-35(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-42(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53B-21(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53B-29(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-02(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General4211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback