MD HB1037 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying from 90 days to 1 year of the action giving rise to the complaint the time limit for filing a complaint with the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board; and requiring the complaint to be in writing on a form authorized by the Board and signed and sworn to under penalty of perjury by the complainant.
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {202013/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Local Laws
Public Safety
Review Boards
Statutes of Limitation
Counties - Local Laws
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Local Laws
Public Safety
Review Boards
Statutes of Limitation