MD HB1036 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain employers of commercial motor vehicle drivers to provide the USDOT number of any entity currently owned by the employer and certain website addresses to a prospective employee driver on a bona fide offer of employment; and providing certain civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Commercial Motor Carriers – Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran’s Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {660314/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB844 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16803(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation16806(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback