MD HB1035 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting referral of a patient to a certifying provider by certain persons or entities.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599 |
2018-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {516681/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |