MD HB1033 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain persons to record electronically a release related to motor vehicle liens with the Motor Vehicle Administration within 5 business days; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Administration to develop and implement an electronic system for recording and releasing security interests; authorizing the Administration to make certain information available electronically; authorizing certain parties to submit to the Administration certain electronic lien information on behalf of certain other parties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-12SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {960118/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB778 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law121024(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law12622(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13108.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13610(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback