MD HB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to place an inmate who is a parent of a minor child in a correctional facility that is within 250 miles from the inmate's permanent address under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adopt certain regulations authorizing visitation of an inmate by the inmate's minor children; prohibiting use of a physical restraint on a certain inmate who has delivered a baby at a certain time unless certain requirements are met; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
Sponsors
Del. Dan Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Education
Food
Health
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Job Training
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
Women
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Education
Food
Health
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Job Training
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
Women