MD HB1031 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Maryland Department of Labor, and the Department of Human Services to make certain reports to the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness on or before November 15, 2020, and November 15, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB973 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback