MD HB1031 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a specified provision of law requiring an individual to be registered and approved by the State Board of Pharmacy as a pharmacy technician before performing delegated pharmacy acts does not apply to a specified pharmacy student currently completing the first year of a professional pharmacy education program and performs, under the direct supervision of a licensed pharmacist, delegated pharmacy acts in accordance with specified regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Technicians - Exemption for Pharmacy Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {426589/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Exemptions
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Students
Exemptions
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Students