MD HB1030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain employers are not liable, under certain circumstances, for negligently hiring or failing to adequately supervise an employee based on evidence that the employee has received probation before judgment for an offense or has been convicted of an offense; providing that the Act does not limit or abrogate certain other immunities or defenses; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings5427(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback