MD HB1029 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the scope of apprenticeship and training programs that may receive certain support through the Clean Energy Workforce Account from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund for clean energy industry development; providing that $750,000 in funds from the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, be designated for the recruitment of individuals, including veterans and formerly incarcerated individuals, to the pre-apprenticeship jobs training programs and registered apprenticeship jobs training programs beginning in fiscal 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-12SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (135-3)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {733895/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB224 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment11708.1(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback