MD HB1029 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the hours of sale for consumption on the licensed premises of a holder of a Class BD-BWL license in Montgomery County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue a caterer's license to a holder of a Class BD-BWL license; and specifying that a limit on the maximum number of specified licenses a person may hold includes no more than one Class BD-BWL license.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License - Hours of Sale MC 17-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Retail Sales