MD HB1028 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain notice in order for the law enforcement agency to designate the person as a criminal gang member or criminal gang associate in a shared gang database; requiring a certain notice to contain certain information; providing that a certain person may submit a certain request regarding criminal gang status; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain information under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Criminal Gangs - Database (Fair and Accurate Gang Database Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2019-03-12HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback