MD HB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain definitions applicable to certain prohibitions against possessing, distributing, and creating child pornography; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing and intentionally retaining a certain representation showing a computer-generated image that is indistinguishable from an actual and identifiable child under the age of 16 years portrayed in a certain manner; defining "indistinguishable from an actual child"; and applying certain penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Child Pornography

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSenators Cassilly, West, and Waldstreicher
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-04HouseDelegates Atterbeary, R. Watson, and Pippy
2019-04-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-04HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-04HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {518379/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {642213/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1027&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1027f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1027t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1027e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_325_hb1027e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1027_64221301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1027_51837901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1027_92332201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1027_32352801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1027.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1027_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0663.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1027_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1114.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1027_32352801.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1582.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1450.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback