MD HB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain definitions applicable to certain prohibitions against possessing, distributing, and creating child pornography; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing and intentionally retaining a certain representation showing a computer-generated image that is indistinguishable from an actual child under a certain age portrayed in a certain manner; and applying certain penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Child Pornography

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {642213/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback