MD HB1026 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing specified employees a total of 6 workweeks of unpaid parental leave in a 12-month period under specified circumstances; authorizing an employer to deny unpaid parental leave to an eligible employee under specified circumstances; authorizing, under specified circumstances, an employer to require an eligible employee, or an eligible employee to elect, to substitute paid leave for any part of or all of the period of parental leave; requiring employers to maintain health coverage during the duration of parental leave; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-41) (Y: 92 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-36) (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-36) (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334 |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-41) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887674/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-36) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Arora) {723729/2 |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243497/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Adoption
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Damages
Foster Care
Health Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Notices
Pregnancy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Damages
Foster Care
Health Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Notices
Pregnancy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment