MD HB1025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture, in coordination with the Department of Natural Resources, to establish a certain program to address the illegal use of carbofuran and to eliminate stockpiles of carbofuran in the State; prohibiting a person from possessing or storing any quantity of carbofuran in the State on or after January 1, 2024; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture, the Secretary of Natural Resources, or a Natural Resources police officer to seize any quantity of carbofuran for enforcement purposes; etc.
Title
Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
Sponsors
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pest Control
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pest Control
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 5-2B | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5-2B | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5-2B | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5-2B | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |