MD HB1025 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to coordinate with the Prince George's County public school system to study the development of the Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program that integrates math, reading, science, technology, and social sciences content into summer parks and recreation programs offered in Prince George's County; requiring the Commission to report on the feasibility of implementing the Program to the Prince George's County House Delegation on or before December 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program - Study PG/MC 108-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {155667/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use25901(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback