MD HB1025 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations establishing certain procedures to address cheating and the use of cheating or thieving devices in certain video lottery facilities, parking areas, and adjacent facilities by certain persons or individuals; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations ensuring that certain individuals are charged with criminal trespass; etc.
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Gaming
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Theft
Trespass
Video
Equipment
Gaming
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Theft
Trespass
Video