MD HB1023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of State Police to collect, analyze, and disseminate, and law enforcement agencies to submit to the Department, certain information about law enforcement employees; altering the information that law enforcement agencies are required to submit to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to include each serious officer-involved incident each year; requiring the Department of Legislative Services and the Department of State Police to enter into a certain memorandum of understanding; etc.
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-1) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-37) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883125/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB785 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety
State Government - General Assembly
State Police, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Communications
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety
State Government - General Assembly
State Police, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 2 | 1261 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |