MD HB1023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the juvenile court, in a certain case in which jurisdiction is transferred from a court exercising criminal jurisdiction, to issue body attachments for witnesses as provided by a certain Maryland Rule.
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsors
Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senators Brochin, Ramirez, and Ready |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor, and Cluster |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {508070/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |