MD HB1022 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2020-2021 school year, to report certain data and information for each alternative school within its jurisdiction to the State Department of Education; requiring the Department, on or before October 1 each year, beginning in 2021, to report to the Governor and the General Assembly the data and information required to be reported by the county boards; prohibiting the required enrollment of certain students from public schools in an alternative school, with a certain exception; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Alternative Schools – Reporting Requirements and Restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {355863/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB830 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7125(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7305.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback