MD HB1021 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from 106 to 120 days, the period during which an employer is not required to allow an employee to use earned sick and safe leave; altering the circumstances under which an employer is required to reinstate certain unused sick and safe leave; and altering the circumstances under which an employer is authorized to require an employee who uses earned sick and safe leave to provide certain verification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB906 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment31304(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment31305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback